Case Information: 37302 | |||
Short Caption: | CURAZZATO VS. DISTRICT COURT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A354863 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/17/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/17/2001 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 01-01002 | |
01/17/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
01/22/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from Kenneth Frizzell-check no. 2213. | ||
01/25/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from Kenneth G. Frizzell-check no. 2220. | ||
03/15/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. | 01-04656 | |
04/16/2001 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Party in Interest's Answer to Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Mailed on: 4/13/01. | 01-06476 | |
12/27/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Oral Argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. | 01-21779 | |
03/13/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition." SNP02M-WM/DA/ML | 02-04504 | |
04/09/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 02-04617 | |
04/09/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |