Case Information: 33153 | |||
Short Caption: | GASTON (DEAUNDRAY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 33908 , 41096 , 52768 , 56130 , 57997 , 61154 , 64314 , 68325 , 74654 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C107652 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/11/1999 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/13/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
10/13/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | ||
11/06/1998 | Other Incoming Document | Received Proper Person Document. Motion for Appointment of Counsel on Appeal. | ||
11/10/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 33070, 33103, 33117, 33120, 33153, 33185, 33199, 33200, 33264, 33265. | ||
03/11/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 6 (copies). Mailed on: 3/9/99. | ||
03/11/1999 | Other | Other. Case submitted on the record this day. | ||
03/11/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/16/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-14295 | |
09/12/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-14474 | |
09/12/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/06/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. | 00-14474 |