Case Information: 83-FM-0955 | |||
Short Caption: | PADGETT, THOMAS JR. PADGETT, FRANCES | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Other Family |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 08/12/1983 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/12/1983 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/09/1983 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/23/1984 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 04/12/1984 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N | |||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | PADGETT, THOMAS JR. PADGETT, FRANCES | |||
01/01/1906 | VACATED JOHN C. LENAHAN | |||
08/12/1983 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
11/09/1983 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
01/23/1984 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
04/12/1984 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
07/25/1984 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |