judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

STATE OF TEXAS v. J. B. WALES, ET AL.

Case: A-4968
A-4968
11/22/1954
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
J. B. WALES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
04/18/1955Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/10/1955Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/14/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/02/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
11/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
04/30/1955Response to Motion filed
04/18/1955Brief in Support of Petition
03/10/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/14/1954Reply to Response
12/02/1954Response to Petition
11/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/22/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. B. Wales, et al.Respondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information