Case Information: 37284 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO KENNERSON AND VIEIRA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D253915 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/12/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. (fee waived per order filed in the distrcit court on April 17, 2001 - see 4/27/01 docket entry). | ||
01/12/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-00729 | |
02/01/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 01-02167 | |
02/05/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing. | 01-02332 | |
04/05/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On February 1, 2001, appellant filed a motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal. To date, the required filing fee has not been paid. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, submit the $200 filing fee to the clerk of this court. We defer ruling on the motion to dismiss pending the submission of the filing fee. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. | 01-05871 | |
04/27/2001 | Other | Other. Filed letter from attorney David C. Amesbury regarding filing fee (copy of district court order appointing counsel and waiving fees filed April 17, 2001, attached). | 01-07106 | |
06/05/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. We vacate our April 5, 2001, order directing appellant to pay the filing fee. Further, we grant appellant's February 1, 2001, motion and " . . . we dismiss this appeal." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR | 01-09313 | |
06/05/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |