Case Information: 82-CV-0521 | |||
Short Caption: | JEFFERSON FEDERAL SAVINGS AND BERKS TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA10303-80 | Filed Date: | 04/06/1982 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/06/1982 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 09/24/1982 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/18/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 04/16/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | JEFFERSON FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION BERKS TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY | |||
04/06/1982 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
09/24/1982 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
01/18/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
04/16/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
02/23/1984 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |