Case Information: 37294 | |||
Short Caption: | HAWTHORNE (ADAM) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C170219 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/16/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/16/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-00857 | |
03/12/2001 | Order/Counsel | Filed Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel. Otherwise, district court shall order that within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. District court clerk: 5 days to transmit district court order to this court and serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant's counsel. Counsel: 10 days to enter appearance. fn1[All filing deadlines shall run from the date on which counsel enters an appearance with this court.] | 01-04395 | |
04/30/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Emmett W. Lally. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-07202 | |
05/02/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Locating Appellant and Proof of Service of Entry of Appearance. | 01-07355 | |
05/02/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/2/00, 10/9/00, 10/23/00, 10/30/00 (Hansen), 12/18/00, 12/21/00, 4/19/01. To Court Reporters: Shirlee Prawalsky and Carrie Hansen. | 01-07357 | |
05/07/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-07578 | |
05/07/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 10/2/00, 10/9/00, 10/23/00, 10/30/00 (Hansen), 12/21/00 and 4/19/01. Court Reporters: Shirlee Prawalsky and Carrie Hansen. | 01-07618 | |
05/23/2001 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed certified copy of minure order and Notice of Appointment of Counsel filed in district court on 5/18/01 appointing Emmett Lally as counsel for appellant. | 01-08690 | |
05/29/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Supplemental Transcripts requested: November 9, 2000. To Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. | 01-08994 | |
06/04/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: November 9, 2000. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. | 01-09271 | |
08/02/2001 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 08/01/01. | 01-13062 | |
08/02/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 01-13063 | |
08/31/2001 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. | 01-14761 | |
09/06/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Establish Designated Date for Computation of Timeto File Reply Brief or Establish Date by which said Brief Shall be Due. | 01-15019 | |
09/17/2001 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Answer to Motion to Estabkish Designated Date for Computaion of Time to File Brief or establish date by which said Brief shall be due. | 01-15658 | |
09/25/2001 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 09/21/01. | 01-16147 | |
10/01/2001 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed September 6, 2001, for clarification of the due date for the reply brief. On September 17, 2001, respondent filed an answer. Using the postmark date of August 29, 2001 as the service date, the reply brief was due to be filed on October 1, 2001. fn1[Appellant's reply brief was timely filed on September 25, 2001.] | 01-16474 | |
11/15/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn12[Pursuant to NRAP 34(f)(1) we have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 01-19064 | |
12/12/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-19654 | |
12/12/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/17/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Attorney Emmett W. Lally. | 01-21183 | |
01/18/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2001. | 01-19654 |