judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GOODWIN, MYRTLE BARNES, NORMAN L.

Case Information: 82-CV-0500
Short Caption:GOODWIN, MYRTLE BARNES, NORMAN L.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LT58621-81Filed Date:05/04/1982

Opening Event Date:05/04/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/14/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/09/1982
Argued/Submitted:11/30/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GOODWIN, MYRTLE BARNES, NORMAN L.
05/04/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/14/1982FiledRecord Completed
08/09/1982FiledBriefing Completed
11/30/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/07/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition