judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAS VEGAS ASSOCIATES VS. WILSHIRE PLAZA DEV. CO.

Case Information: 37292
Short Caption:LAS VEGAS ASSOCIATES VS. WILSHIRE PLAZA DEV. CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A392982Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/22/2001 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/12/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/16/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Smith Larsen & Wixom, Chartered--check no. 005423.
01/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. 01-00847
01/17/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. D.C. docket entries and minutes. (Incorrect copies mailed with NOA packet.) Due Date: 10 days
01/22/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/26/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Notice of Appeal packet containing correct copies of district court docket entries and district court minutes. 01-01791
02/01/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Israel Kunin.
04/20/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-06766
04/20/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
05/04/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-07474
05/09/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-07742
05/16/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: July 11-12, 2000, October 17, 2000 and December 11, 2000. To Court Reporter: Joy Hinck. 01-08164
06/18/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/11/00; 07/12/00; 10/17/00; and 12/11/00. Court Reporter: Joy Hinck. 01-10174
09/05/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 11, 2001. 01-14956
09/12/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 09/11/01. 01-15386
09/12/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. 01-15387
09/28/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 09/27/01. 01-16360
10/30/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 12, 2001. 01-18148
11/13/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 11/10/01. 01-18822
03/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-04437
03/12/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
05/14/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML. 02-08482
06/03/2002Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Smith Larsen & Wixom, Chartered--check no. 007388.
06/03/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: May 31, 2002. 02-09655
07/10/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." - SNP02-CY/DA/ML. 02-11790
07/25/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-11842
07/25/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/14/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 1, 2002. 02-11842