Case Information: 37297 | |||
Short Caption: | COMBS VS. DANIEL | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 36472 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9903170 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/16/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from James and Jean Combs (cash). | ||
01/16/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-00893 | |
02/22/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-03324 | |
03/20/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-03729 | |
03/20/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/29/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 28, 2001. | 01-03729 |