judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4990
A-4990
12/09/1954
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. ELLA GATES AND HUSBAND, SAM GATES
PAULINE HENSEL ASHER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/15/1955Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/12/1955Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/16/1955Response to Brief filedPetitioner
03/09/1955Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/20/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
12/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/20/1955Response to Motion filed
06/15/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/01/1955Dissenting opinion issued.
06/01/1955Opinion issued
04/12/1955Supplemental Brief filed
03/16/1955Response to Brief filed
03/09/1955Supplemental Brief filed
02/09/1955Document received (See Remarks)
02/09/1955Document received (See Remarks)
02/09/1955Document received (See Remarks)
02/09/1955Document received (See Remarks)
02/09/1955Document received (See Remarks)
02/09/1955Document received (See Remarks)
02/09/1955Document received (See Remarks)
12/20/1954Response to Petition
12/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/09/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. Ella Gates and husband, Sam GatesPetitioner
Pauline Hensel Asher, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information