Case Information: 32855 | |||
Short Caption: | FAUGHT VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C93291 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/19/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/19/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. | ||
08/19/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | ||
08/28/1998 | Other Incoming Document | Received Proper Person Document. Motion for Expedited Disposition and/or Remand for Evidentiary Hearing on Post-Conviction Habeas. (Received the original and 2 copies -1 returned to Appellant). | ||
09/16/1998 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32773, 32786, 32792, 32800, 32847, 32853, 32855. | ||
09/21/1998 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. Motion for Expedited Disposition. (Received the original only.) | ||
09/30/1998 | Other Incoming Document | Received Proper Person Document. Letter addressed to Chief Justice Springer regarding requesting action on pending motion. (Received on 9/17/98 - received the original only). | ||
01/19/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 4 (copies). Mailed on: 2 volumes on 1/14/99 and 2 volumes on 1/15/99. | ||
01/19/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/02/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-02183 | |
02/28/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-02396 | |
02/28/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/22/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2001. | 01-02396 |