Case Information: 37321 | |||
Short Caption: | VILLAGE GREEN VS. AMERICAN-NEVADA CORP. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A405744 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/01/2001 / Combs, E. | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/22/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Burdman & Benson, LLP--check no. 10329. | ||
01/22/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. | 01-01339 | |
02/01/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
04/23/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 29, 2001. | 01-06862 | |
06/28/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 01-10960 | |
08/30/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. | 01-14739 | |
11/28/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, apellant has not responded to our order of August 30, 2001, or otherwise communicated with this court. Cause appearing, " . . . we dismiss this appeal as abandoned." SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 01-19913 | |
12/26/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-19961 | |
12/26/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/18/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 31, 2001. | 01-19961 |