judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAMS, RONALD A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0712
Short Caption:WILLIAMS, RONALD A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:81-CF-0712Consolidated: 81-CF-1531 , 81-CF-1535
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:05/28/1981

Opening Event Date:05/28/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/07/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/28/1983
Argued/Submitted:05/04/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, RONALD A. UNITED STATES
05/28/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/07/1981FiledRecord Completed
02/28/1983FiledBriefing Completed
05/04/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/02/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition