judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MITCHELL, SR. (SEAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36197
Short Caption:MITCHELL, SR. (SEAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33705 , 36557 , 38821 , 48838 , 53942
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR960186Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/31/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09172
07/13/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. This is a proper person notice of appeal from a guilty verdict pursuant to a bench trial finding appellant guilty of robbery with the use of a deadly weapon. Our review of this appeal indicates that the notice of appeal may have been prematurely filed. Appellant's counsel shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed. 00-12060
08/10/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 15 & 16, 2000; July 10, 2000. Court Reporter: Eric V. Nelson. Transferred certified copies of transcripts for proceedings conducted on May 15-16, 2000, and July 10, 2000, from Docket No. 36197 to Docket No. 36557. 00-13917
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[On August 10, 2000, certified copies of transcripts for proceedings conducted on May 15-16, 2000, and July 10, 2000, were filed in this court in Docket No. 36197. We direct the clerk of this court to transfer to Docket No. 36557 the certified copies of transcripts filed in Docket No. 36197.] SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-17324
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17443
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 3, 2000. 00-17443