judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

J.D. PETERSON v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, DRIVERS' LICENSE DIVISION

Case Heading (06-209)
Case Number:06-209Case Docketed On:09/11/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:J.D. PETERSON v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, DRIVERS' LICENSE DIVISION
Full Title:J.D. PETERSON, Appellant (Petitioner), v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, DRIVERS' LICENSE DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJ.D. PetersonMike Cornia
AppelleeDepartment of Transportation - Driver Services ProgramPatrick J. Crank
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 90
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/11/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/11/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/11/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/18/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/18/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/08/2006Brief - Appellant; and received copy on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
12/26/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy of of appellee's designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/27/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/09/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/29/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes: Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
05/30/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/15/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/15/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/21/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal