Case: A-4812
A-4812
07/14/1954
Application for Writ of Error
T. W. PATTON
J. W. NICHOLAS AND ROBERT R. PATKS, INDIVIDUALLY AND JOINTLY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/1955 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
02/15/1955 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
02/15/1955 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
02/08/1955 | Post submission brief filed | Respondent | | |
02/08/1955 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
11/22/1954 | Response to Reply filed | Respondent | | |
10/30/1954 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
10/25/1954 | Supplement to Response | Respondent | | |
10/19/1954 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
10/19/1954 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
09/10/1954 | Response to Petition | Petitioner | | |
07/14/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Respondent | | |
07/14/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/14/1958 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
10/08/1958 | Motion for production of documents filed | | ||
01/06/1956 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
01/05/1956 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
06/01/1955 | Opinion issued | | ||
03/07/1955 | Reply to Response | | ||
03/03/1955 | Miscellaneous Motion | | ||
02/15/1955 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
02/15/1955 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
02/08/1955 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
02/08/1955 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
12/14/1954 | Letter Filed | | ||
12/01/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/01/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/01/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/01/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/01/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/01/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/01/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/01/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/22/1954 | Response to Reply filed | | ||
10/30/1954 | Reply to Response | | ||
10/25/1954 | Supplement to Response | | ||
10/19/1954 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
10/19/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
09/10/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
07/16/1954 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | | ||
07/14/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/14/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
07/14/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
T. W. Patton | Petitioner | |
J. W. Nicholas and Robert R. Patks, Individually and Jointly | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information