judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITE (SEAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36198
Short Caption:WHITE (SEAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32482 , 76041
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C112840Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/24/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/31/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09174
06/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Certified copy of the record due: 30 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-10874
07/24/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 13. Mailed on 07/20/00. 00-12714
07/24/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Order of Affirmance and Dismissing Appeal. Having reviewed the records on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court in Docket No. 32482 and dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 36198." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. Nos. 32482, 36198 (Nos. 32482 and 36198 are not consolidated.) 00-16138
09/27/2000MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to file Petition for Rehearing. (Nos. 32482 and 36198).
09/27/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Petition for Rehearing. (Nos. 32482 and 36198).
10/18/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-MS/DA/ML. Nos. 32482, 36198. 00-18474
11/03/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-18993
11/03/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-18993