judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AARON FLOOD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-127)
Case Number:06-127Case Docketed On:06/08/2006
Linked To: 06-126
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:AARON FLOOD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:AARON FLOOD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAaron FloodD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Eric Alan Johnson
Scott L. Mullins
Geoffrey Gunnerson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 167
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/21/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/05/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/08/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/25/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/25/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/08/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/11/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/25/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/26/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/29/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal and copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
01/02/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/03/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/16/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/21/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/05/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/06/2007Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
05/07/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
05/07/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Scott L. Mullins and Geoffrey GunnersonNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
05/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk MorganNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/05/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, exhibits; and Volume IV, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Scott L. Mullins, Student Intern, for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/12/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court ( Kirk Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Eric A. Johnson, Director, PAP, and Scott L. Mullins, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Mullins for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/12/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/23/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming. Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/08/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/08/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/13/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/09/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal