judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KELVIN J. MILES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0731
Short Caption:KELVIN J. MILES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Lead:81-CF-0731Consolidated: 82-CF-0246
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5256-79Filed Date:

Opening Event Date:Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKelvin J. Miles N
Charles J. Ogletree YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Anita J. Stephens YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MILES, KELVIN J. UNITED STATES
08/24/2005APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL and lift the mandate.
09/07/2005On consideration of appellant's pro se motion to recall mandate, it is ORDERED that the motion is denied. (RD,NW,BE)
09/28/2005APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION of the denial of motion to reinstate appeal and lift the mandate.
10/03/2005On consideration of appellant's pro se motion for reconsideration of this court's order denying his motion to recall the mandate, it is ORDERED that the motion for reconsideration is denied. (RD,NW,BE)
01/06/2006RECEIVED appellant's motion to recall the mandate, reinstate the appeal and for appointment of counsel.
01/12/2006On consideration of appellant's pro se motion to reinstate appeal, it is ORDERED that the motion is denied. (RD,BE)
03/14/2007APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION
04/04/2007On consideration of appellant's pro se motion for leave to proceed and for other relief, it is ORDERED thast the motion is denied. (RD,NW,BE)
02/26/2013LodgedMotion To Expedite Appeal (Appellant)