judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

F. M. CORZELIUS, ET AL. v. H. M. HARRELL

Case: A-167
A-167
05/08/1944
Application for Writ of Error
F. M. CORZELIUS, ET AL.
H. M. HARRELL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/01/1945Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/19/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/06/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
11/01/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/31/1944Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/26/1944Response to Brief filedRespondent
10/23/1944Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
10/21/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/18/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/18/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/01/1945Reply to Response
04/25/1945Response to Motion filed
04/23/1945Additional Copies receivedOverruled
04/19/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/13/1944Letter Filed
11/08/1944Additional Copies received
11/06/1944Brief on the Merits
11/01/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/31/1944Response to Brief filed
10/26/1944Response to Brief filed
10/25/1944Additional Copies received
10/23/1944Brief on the Merits
10/21/1944Brief on the Merits
10/07/1944Motion to re-set submission date filed.Filing granted
06/07/1944Document received (See Remarks)
06/07/1944Document received (See Remarks)
06/07/1944Document received (See Remarks)
06/07/1944Document received (See Remarks)
06/07/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/18/1944Reply to Response
05/18/1944Response to Petition
05/08/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/08/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. A. RauhutAmicus Curiae
F. M. Corzelius, et al.Petitioner
H. M. HarrellRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information