Case Information: 37346 | |||
Short Caption: | GALE INSULATION VS. DURABLE HOMES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 37491 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A404032 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/01/2001 / Combs, E. | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/25/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Stephenson & Dickinson--check no. 6692. | ||
01/25/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. | 01-01702 | |
02/01/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/28/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 13, 2001. | 01-05440 | |
06/28/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 01-10958 | |
08/06/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal Pursant to Settlement Conference. | 01-13241 | |
09/21/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 01-15931 | |
09/21/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |