Case: 03-98-00094-CR
03-98-00094-CR
02/23/1998
Other Felony
Coleen Deleon
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/20/2001 | Case stored | | |||||
10/12/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
10/07/1999 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||
09/08/1999 | Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court | Refused | | ||||
05/17/1999 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
05/10/1999 | Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court | | |||||
04/08/1999 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | | ||||
03/29/1999 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |||||
03/11/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
10/19/1998 | Submitted | | |||||
10/19/1998 | Submission | | |||||
09/25/1998 | Submission | | |||||
09/21/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
09/18/1998 | Brief filed | | |||||
08/25/1998 | Brief filed | | |||||
07/10/1998 | Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed of | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/09/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
06/08/1998 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
06/08/1998 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
04/20/1998 | Notice received | | |||||
03/17/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
03/16/1998 | Notice received | | |||||
02/23/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
02/23/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/12/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Deleon, Coleen | Appellant | Mr. Melvin Gray |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. Stephen H. Smith |
State Prosecuting Attorney | Interested party | The Honorable Matthew W. Paul |
Trial Court Information
119th District Court
Tom Green
Honorable Dick Alcala
B-97-0286-S
2 yrs./$1000 (COMM SUPER)