Case Information: 37348 | |||
Short Caption: | GRIFFIN VS. SPARKLE ENVIRONMENTAL SALES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A400584 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Leavitt | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/01/2001 / Combs, E. | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/25/2001 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Leavitt, Sully & Rivers. | ||
01/25/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Leavitt, Sully & Rivers--check no. 7017. | ||
01/25/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. | 01-01706 | |
02/01/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/20/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 01-03112 | |
02/22/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. E. Leslie Combs, Jr. | ||
02/26/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 01-03559 | |
02/26/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days | ||
03/08/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Schedule. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 01-04240 | |
03/12/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-04379 | |
03/19/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/29/00. To Court Reporter: Department III - 8th District. | 01-04879 | |
03/26/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 11/29/00. Court Reporter: James A. Helleso. | 01-05227 | |
07/02/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 6, 2001. | 01-11090 | |
08/06/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 01-13254 | |
10/09/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties filed on August 6, 2001, and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 01-16912 | |
10/09/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |