Case: 01-94-00297-CR
01-94-00297-CR
03/22/1994
Robbery
Perales, Blas Manuel
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/21/1995 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
11/21/1995 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
11/06/1995 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
10/11/1995 | Petition for discretionary review disposed | Refused | |
04/28/1995 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |
04/25/1995 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |
04/21/1995 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
03/23/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/23/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/07/1995 | Submitted | | |
03/07/1995 | Submission | | |
03/07/1995 | Submitted | | |
01/23/1995 | Submission | | |
01/04/1995 | Brief Due | | |
12/30/1994 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
12/30/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/30/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/22/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
12/09/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
11/17/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
11/07/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
10/13/1994 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
10/13/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
10/03/1994 | Motion to consolidate cases filed | | |
10/03/1994 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
07/14/1994 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
07/14/1994 | Statement of facts filed | | |
07/01/1994 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
06/09/1994 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
05/31/1994 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
05/27/1994 | Brief due for retained counsel | | |
04/22/1994 | Transcript filed | | |
03/22/1994 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
03/22/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/23/1994 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/21/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TEXAS, THE STATE OF | Criminal - State of Texas | Julie Klibert |
PERALES, BLAS MANUEL | Criminal - Appellant | William Burge |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes |
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
9400798
99 yrs tdc