judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SARTORI, JOSEPH GLENN SOCIETY OF AMERICAN MILITARY

Case Information: 84-CV-1298
Short Caption:SARTORI, JOSEPH GLENN SOCIETY OF AMERICAN MILITARYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA6820-84Filed Date:09/21/1984

Opening Event Date:09/21/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/26/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/24/1984
Argued/Submitted:03/28/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Calvin Steinmetz YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
William B. Cummings YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SARTORI, JOSEPH GLENN SOCIETY OF AMERICAN MILITARY ENGINEERS ET AL
09/21/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/26/1984FiledRecord Completed
12/24/1984FiledBriefing Completed
03/28/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/24/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition