Case Information: 84-CV-1300 | |||
Short Caption: | THOMPSON, DONNA YAVALAR, HUDAI | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant |
Lead: | 84-AA-1236 | Consolidated: | 84-CV-1300, 84-CV-1301 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | LT47509-84 | Filed Date: | 09/24/1984 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/24/1984 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 01/22/1985 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/02/1986 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 05/14/1986 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer |
Appellant | John Doe | N | |||
Appellee | Hudai Yavalar | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | THOMPSON, DONNA ET AL YAVALAR, HUDAI | |||
09/24/1984 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
01/22/1985 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
01/02/1986 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
05/14/1986 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
05/30/1986 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |