Case Information: 37334 | |||
Short Caption: | HAGLER (WARREN) VS. DISTRICT COURT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35994 , 36795 , 37173 , 37240 , 37275 , 37628 , 37642 , 37828 , 37829 , 38181 , 38519 , 38811 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C153186 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/23/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/23/2001 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus Peremptory: NRS 34.150. | 01-01521 | |
02/22/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML | 01-03336 | |
03/16/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On February 22, 2001, this court issued an order denying petitioner's petition for a writ of mandamus. On February 26, 2001, this court received a supplement to the petition. We have reviewed the supplement, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted. | 01-04735 | |
03/20/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 01-03712 | |
03/20/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |