judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FOGARTY, WILLIAM J. BANKER'S TRUST COMPANY

Case Information: 84-CV-1277
Short Caption:FOGARTY, WILLIAM J. BANKER'S TRUST COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA472-83Filed Date:08/06/1984

Opening Event Date:08/06/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/15/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/07/1984
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
J. Gordon Forester YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard G. Wise NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Robert C. Smith NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles H. Fleischer YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FOGARTY, WILLIAM J. ET AL BANKER'S TRUST COMPANY
08/06/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/15/1984FiledRecord Completed
12/07/1984FiledBriefing Completed
04/10/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition