judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BASKERVILLE, LAWRENCE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.

Case Information: 84-CV-1290
Short Caption:BASKERVILLE, LAWRENCE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA8406-82Filed Date:09/14/1984

Opening Event Date:09/14/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/04/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/28/1985
Argued/Submitted:06/12/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard E. Cassell YN
AppellantRobert Novel NPro SeN
AppellantAndrew Watts NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Don F. Ryder YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BASKERVILLE, LAWRENCE ET AL OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE CO. ET AL
09/14/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/04/1985FiledRecord Completed
02/28/1985FiledBriefing Completed
06/12/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/18/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition