judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-4819
A-4819
07/19/1954
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. RANDOLPH ENGLISH, ET AL.
DUDLEY JONES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/20/1955Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/02/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
07/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/20/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/05/1955Opinion issued
11/02/1954Response to Petition
10/06/1954Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1954Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1954Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1954Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1954Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1954Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1954Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1954Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1954Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1954Document received (See Remarks)
07/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/19/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dudley Jones, et al.Respondent
Mrs. Randolph English, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information