judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

COLE, BETTIE M. UNITED STATES SERVICE

Case Information: 84-CV-1218
Short Caption:COLE, BETTIE M. UNITED STATES SERVICEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA3445-81Filed Date:08/28/1984

Opening Event Date:08/28/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/28/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/31/1985
Argued/Submitted:11/26/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Keith Winston WattersYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Frank J. Martell YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COLE, BETTIE M. UNITED STATES SERVICE INDUSTRIES INC.
08/28/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/28/1985FiledRecord Completed
07/31/1985FiledBriefing Completed
11/26/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/27/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition