judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LINTNER, CHARLES DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 84-CV-1317
Short Caption:LINTNER, CHARLES DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA12729-81Filed Date:08/07/1984

Opening Event Date:08/07/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/26/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/15/1985
Argued/Submitted:07/02/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Robert Cadeaux YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charlotte Brookins-Hudson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LINTNER, CHARLES DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
08/07/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/26/1984FiledRecord Completed
03/15/1985FiledBriefing Completed
07/02/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/03/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition