Case Information: 39262 | |||
Short Caption: | SLEEPER (DENNIS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR020023 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/28/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/28/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 02-03748 | |
03/07/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Proceedings: February 14, 2002. Court Reporter: C. Brown. | 02-04134 | |
03/07/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Transcripts at Public Expense and Specification of Error (Request for Submission) - FILED IN THE DISTRICT COURT ON MARCH 5, 2002. | 02-04135 | |
03/18/2002 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: February 14, 2002. Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. | 02-04793 | |
04/09/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 02-06298 | |
04/09/2002 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 02-06299 | |
04/16/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 02-06795 | |
05/09/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-08119 | |
06/04/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-08335 | |
06/04/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/13/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 6, 2002. | 02-08335 |