judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOMINGUEZ (LOUIS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 35664
Short Caption:DOMINGUEZ (LOUIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR891789Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/17/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-02540
03/10/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: March 22, 2000. 00-03775
03/22/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Continuance and Affidavit in Support Thereof. 00-04576
03/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On March 22, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time in which to file the fast track statement in this appeal. The motion is denied. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement with 15 days of this order of show cause why she should not be sanctioned. 00-05215
04/18/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-06176
04/18/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-06177
04/25/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-06672
05/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-07771
06/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-09554
06/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/21/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 15, 2000. 00-09554