Case Information: 35663 | |||
Short Caption: | WHITE (GARY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991603 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/17/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/17/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-02538 | |
03/09/2000 | Order/Counsel | Filed Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Washoe County Deputy Public Defender Richard Molezzo shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. | 00-03703 | |
03/22/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 11/17/99, 11/29/99. Court Reporter: K. Yates and W. Pearson. Filed in district court on: 3/20/00. | 00-04566 | |
03/24/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: November 17, 1999. Court Reporter: Karen Yates. | 00-04799 | |
04/20/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 00-06379 | |
04/25/2000 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: November 29, 1999. Court Reporter: Wendy Pearson. | 00-06642 | |
04/25/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 30 days of this order. | 00-06663 | |
05/26/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 00-08951 | |
05/26/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 00-08952 | |
06/08/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 00-09673 | |
07/05/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-11450 | |
08/01/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-13280 | |
08/01/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/08/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 2, 2000. | 00-13280 |