Case: PD-0332-98
PD-0332-98
03/05/1998
PDR Case Type
HEUERMANN, KEVIN SHAY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/26/1998 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
06/10/1998 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
06/10/1998 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
04/07/1998 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
03/05/1998 | PDR FILED | | |
03/05/1998 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/06/1998 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Heuermann, Kevin Shay | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Michael P. Fosher |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John B. Holmes |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-96-00833-CR
AFF 1-15-98
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
Honorable BRIAN RAINS
697596