judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUKE VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36195
Short Caption:DUKE VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33874 , 35270 , 35377 , 35389 , 36716 , 42820 , 43337 , 46444 , 47144 , 48263 , 53705 , 57570 , 60123
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A340508Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/30/2000Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-09024
05/30/2000Petition/WritFiled Exhibits to Petition for Writ. Blind Petitioner's Index to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-09026
07/27/2000MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Second Supplement of Points and Authorities to her Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed May 30, 2000, Case No. 36195. 00-13083
11/20/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny the petition." fn1[Petitioner's failure to pay the filing fee of $200.00 constitutes an additional basis for denying this writ.] fn2[Although petitioner was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from petitioner, as well as the documents received from the real parties in interest, and we deny all relief requested by petitioner. We also deny as moot the real parties in interest's motion to strike petitioner's second supplement of points and authorities to this petition.] SNP00A-RR/CY/NB 00-20385
09/05/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We note that petitioner has pending before this court a separate appeal from the final judgment in the underlying case, which implicates the same issues raised in the writ petition.] SNP01A-CY/RR/NB 01-14993
09/21/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-15004
09/21/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.