judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BELL, LAWRENCE A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0644
Short Caption:BELL, LAWRENCE A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1819-80Filed Date:05/13/1981

Opening Event Date:05/13/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/10/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/06/1983
Argued/Submitted:10/06/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BELL, LAWRENCE A. UNITED STATES
05/13/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/10/1982FiledRecord Completed
07/06/1983FiledBriefing Completed
10/06/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/28/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition