judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-4884
A-4884
08/19/1954
Application for Writ of Error
J. F. NEVINS, ET AL.
W. S. MONTGOMERY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/06/1954Errata FiledRespondent
12/02/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/15/1954Response to Reply filedRespondent
08/30/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/25/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
08/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/06/1954Errata Filed
12/06/1954Response to Motion filed
12/02/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/15/1954Response to Reply filed
08/30/1954Reply to Response
08/25/1954Response to Petition
08/19/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/19/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. S. Montgomery, et al.Respondent
J. F. Nevins, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information