Case: 14-01-00826-CR
14-01-00826-CR
09/10/2001
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Wilson, Rebecca Lynn
The State of Texas
No
7th Court of Appeals
10/11/2001
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/30/2001 | Record due | | |
11/30/2001 | Reporter's Record Due | | |
10/11/2001 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | GRANTED | |
10/11/2001 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | GRANTED | |
10/05/2001 | Docketing statement DUE | | |
09/20/2001 | Clerk's copy of NOA FILED | | |
09/10/2001 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |
09/10/2001 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/17/2001 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
08/10/2001 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |
08/02/2001 | Date of Sentence | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/11/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
WILSON, REBECCA LYNN | Criminal - Appellant | Stephen Christopher Taylor |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Joe L. Price |
Trial Court Information
258th District Court
Trinity
8,469
Life TDCJ & $10,000 fine