Case Information: 85-FM-1047 | |||
Short Caption: | DEANE-FERRILL, MAUREEN A. FERRILL, ROBERT NOLAN | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | D0892-84 | Filed Date: | 07/31/1985 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/31/1985 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/14/1988 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | DEANE-FERRILL, MAUREEN A. FERRILL, ROBERT NOLAN | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 102485 ORDER: GRNTG MO FO APLT NOTE - 01 FOR LV TO FILE CIV APL STATE, NOTE - 02 CLK DIR TO FILE LDGD CIV APL NOTE - 02 STATE; FO: NO 7A, APLT, W/IN NOTE - 03 10 DAYS TO FILE DR & SRT W/CLK NOTE - 03 OF SP CT & SERV COPIES. | |||
07/31/1985 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
09/05/1985 | ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS OTSC - DISM (NO CAS & FEE) SL PANELMK SCDATE 081585 SCHPRD CAS | |||
09/25/1985 | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT AND THE REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DS PANEL SCDATE 092585 SCHPRD MLANA | |||
09/25/1985 | RECEIVED APLT'S ANSWER TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER GG PANEL SCDATE 091685 SCHPRD ANSA | |||
09/25/1985 | RECEIVED CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/25/1985 | RECEIVED APLT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/26/1985 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/27/1985 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/24/1985 | CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/24/1985 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 100785 SCHPRD OPE | |||
12/23/1985 | ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS OTSC - DISM (NO DR/SRT) SL PANELPY SCDATE 110485 SCHPRD DR | |||
02/06/1986 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY & ANSWER TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE--COMBINED IN ONE PLEADG RJG PANEL SCDATE 010286 SCHPRD ANSA | |||
02/06/1986 | RECEIVED DESIGNATION OF RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/03/1986 | DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/03/1986 | ORDER CLK DIR TO FILE LDGD DR & SRT & APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS FROM DATE REC IS FILED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 021886 SCHPRD OPE | |||
03/07/1986 | RECORD ON APPEAL (EXHIBITS: 2 SMALL PICTURES, 1 SMALL ENVELOPE & PAPERS)(RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 050286 SCHPRD R | |||
08/05/1988 | ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 040786 SCHPRD RT | |||
10/07/1988 | ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 10 DAYS OR CASE SHALL STAND DISMISSED. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091488 SCHPRD BA | |||
10/21/1988 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
10/21/1988 | ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD BA | |||
10/21/1988 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE | |||
11/14/1988 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |