Case Information: 85-FM-0569 | |||
Short Caption: | CHAPMAN, JAMES STEPHEN MAKOWSKI, JANET R. | Classification: | Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | D1705-83 | Filed Date: | 05/09/1985 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 05/09/1985 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 09/11/1985 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 12/10/1985 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 03/18/1986 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | CHAPMAN, JAMES STEPHEN MAKOWSKI, JANET R. | |||
05/09/1985 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
09/11/1985 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
12/10/1985 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
03/18/1986 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
03/20/1986 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |