Case Information: 39267 | |||
Short Caption: | BURKETT (JOEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34767 , 39390 , 41504 , 45769 , 63661 , 71725 , 71725-COA , 76647 , 76647-COA , 78774 , 78774-COA , 78868 , 78868-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C052190 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/28/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/28/2002 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Certiorari. | 02-03758 | |
03/15/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Denying Request to Construe Petition as a Notice of Appeal. Petitioner requests this court to construe the instant petition as a notice of appeal from an order of the district court denying a post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Because a notice of appeal must be filed in the district court, petitioner's request is hereby denied. The district court minutes reflect that notice of entry of the decision was served on February 19, 2002. Assuming that the notice of entry was properly served by the clerk of the district court pursuant to NRS 34.830, petitioner's notice of appeal must be filed in the district court on or before March 25, 2002. This court will resolve the remaining issues presented in the instant petition in due course. | 02-04705 | |
04/01/2002 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
04/11/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-06437 | |
05/07/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 02-06806 | |
05/07/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |