Case Information: 35658 | |||
Short Caption: | BOONE (ERIC) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 36994 , 40562 , 51303 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156543 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/17/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/17/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-02507 | |
03/29/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-05011 | |
04/25/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-06696 | |
04/25/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/26/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 11, 2000. | 00-06696 |