Case Information: 35657 | |||
Short Caption: | DIXON (MARCUS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35318 , 43647 , 46152 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C150932 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/16/2001 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/17/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/17/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). | 00-02506 | |
02/29/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested November 10, 1999 through January 13, 2000. To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. | 00-03170 | |
03/03/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 00-03447 | |
03/13/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: November 15, 1999, November 16, 1999, November 17, 1999, November 18, 1999, November 19, 1999 and January 13, 2000. Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. | 00-03890 | |
04/13/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall within 10 days of the date of this order inform this court whether all requested transcripts have been filed. | 00-05933 | |
04/21/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice to the Court re: Request for Transcript of Proceedings. | 00-06429 | |
06/19/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: 6/15/00. | 00-10417 | |
06/19/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 10 days. | ||
06/30/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 00-11185 | |
07/20/2000 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. | 00-12544 | |
07/20/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 00-12545 | |
03/16/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 01-04757 | |
03/16/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Southern Nevada Panel. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB | ||
05/16/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB | 01-08105 | |
06/12/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-08128 | |
06/12/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/05/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2001. | 01-08128 |