Case: A-4886
A-4886
08/20/1954
Application for Writ of Error
W. L. PHILLIPS, ET UX.
W. H. NAUMANN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/17/1955 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
01/12/1955 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
08/20/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/05/1957 | Miscellaneous letter | | ||
02/16/1955 | Opinion issued | | ||
01/17/1955 | Reply to Response | | ||
01/12/1955 | Response to Petition | | ||
11/24/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
08/20/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
08/20/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
W. L. Phillips, et ux. | Petitioner | |
W. H. Naumann, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information