Case: A-4912
A-4912
10/13/1954
Application for Writ of Error
J. R. SWEETEN, ET UX.
J. F. PARK
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/24/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
02/23/1955 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
02/02/1955 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
02/01/1955 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
11/09/1954 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
10/21/1954 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/13/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/15/1971 | Miscellaneous letter | | ||
03/24/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
03/09/1955 | Opinion issued | | ||
02/23/1955 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
02/02/1955 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
02/01/1955 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
12/15/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/15/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/15/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/15/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/15/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/15/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
11/09/1954 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
10/21/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/13/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Perkins, Floyd, and Davis and William S. Clarke | Amicus Curiae | |
John J. Cox | Amicus Curiae | |
J. F. Park | Respondent | |
J. R. Sweeten, et ux. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information