judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HUGH HENDERSON, ET AL. v. SHELL OIL COMPANY, INC., RESPONDANTS OTHER THAN SHELL OIL COMPANY, INC.

Case: A-168
A-168
05/10/1944
Application for Writ of Error
HUGH HENDERSON, ET AL.
SHELL OIL COMPANY, INC., RESPONDANTS OTHER THAN SHELL OIL COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/07/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/07/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/07/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/22/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/10/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/28/1946Motion to Withdraw Filed
11/07/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/07/1944Supplemental Brief filed
06/07/1944Brief on the Merits
05/24/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/24/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/22/1944Response to Petition
05/10/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/10/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hugh Henderson, et al.Petitioner
SHELL OIL COMPANY, INC.Respondent
Respondants Other Than Shell Oil Company, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information