judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEVADA GENERAL INSURANCE VS. LOPEZ

Case Information: 36194
Short Caption:NEVADA GENERAL INSURANCE VS. LOPEZCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34350
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A358109Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/02/2000 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:04/09/2002 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/09/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/30/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lyles & Associates--check no. 26575.
05/30/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09020
06/02/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/19/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-12466
07/19/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
07/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-13181
08/03/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-13436
08/15/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-14231
11/28/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: December 28, 2000. 00-20772
11/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. We suspended the briefing schedule pending further order of this court. 00-20802
12/18/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-22046
01/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. We ordered appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant has responded to our order. We have jurisdiction over this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-01540
02/23/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-03437
02/28/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before March 26, 2001. 01-03660
03/26/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-05254
03/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be filed by April 25, 2001. We do not expect further requests for extensions of time absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-05460
04/26/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 04/25/01. 01-07029
04/26/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. 01-07032
05/25/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 25, 2001. 01-08785
06/22/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-10567
06/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On May 25, 2001, this court granted respondents a 60-day extension of time to and including July 25, 2001, to file and serve the answering brief. On June 22, 2001, respondents filed a motion specifically requesting an extension of time to and including July 25, 2001, to file the answering brief. Because the answering brief is not due to be filed until July 25, 2001, we deny, as moot, respondents' motion for an extension of time. 01-10922
06/28/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Non-Opposition to Motion to Extend Time for Filing the Respondents' Brief (no action required). 01-10984
07/26/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-12653
07/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed July 26, 2001. Respondents shall have to and including August 24, 2001, to file and serve the answering brief. We caution counsel that failure to demonstrate extreme and unforeseeable circumstances for additional requests for extension of time may result in the denial of the motion. 01-12746
08/03/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Extend Time for Filing the Respondent's Brief. 01-13163
08/27/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Fourth Request.) 01-14506
08/30/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. 01-14722
09/27/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (faxed copy of a stipulation attached to motion). 01-16333
10/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On August 27, 2001, respondents filed a motion for a fourth extension of time to file the answering brief. On August 30, 2001, the parties filed a stipulation for an extension of time to file the answering brief. We elect to treat the stipulation as a joint motion. Because the answering brief has not yet been filed, we deny the motions as moot. On September 27, 2001, respondents filed a motion for a fifth extension of time to file the answering brief. Extreme and unforeseeable circumstances having been demonstrated, we grant the unopposed motion. Respondents shall have to and including October 2, 2001, to file the answering brief. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31 (a)(1). 01-16539
10/04/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 10/02/01. 01-16711
11/01/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: December 3, 2001. 01-18290
11/15/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Notice of Non-Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Extend Time for File Reply Brief (no action requried). 01-19113
12/05/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 12/03/01. 01-20377
02/25/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 9, 2002, at 10:30 a.m. (NNP02-MS/RR/NB)
03/25/2002BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. (Respondents). STRICKEN BY ORDER 03/28/02. 02-05236
03/26/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
03/28/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Striking Supplemental Authorities. This appeal is scheduled for oral argument before the Northern Nevada Panel in Carson City on April 9, 2002, at 10:30 a.m. On March 25, 2002, respondents filed supplemental authorities. The purpose of supplemental authorities is to allow the parties to bring to the attention of the court new authorities that were not available at the time the parties were preparing their respective briefs. All of the cases respondents include in the supplemental authorities were clearly available when respondents were preparing the answering brief. The clerk of this court shall strike respondents' supplemental authorities filed on March 25, 2002. 02-05516
04/09/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Argued by: John R. Hawley for Appellant and Daniel F. Polsenberg for Respondents. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
09/11/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Shearing, J. and Rose, J. Becker, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-15701
10/03/2002Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
10/03/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: September 30, 2002. 02-17113
10/04/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (Rehearing) Due Date: 10 days.
10/15/2002Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Beckley Singleton--check no. 093195.
10/31/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). Shearing, J. And Rose, J. Becker, J., dissenting. NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-18752
11/26/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-18873
11/26/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 3, 2002. 02-18873